DARE2EXPRESS

Charity number: 1166072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 14 February 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 14 February 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time Download