Financial history ST JAMES DEEPING SIGNAL BOX GROUP

Charity number: 1164467
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £25.36k £5.53k £15.67k £2.08k £16.77k
Total expenditure £3.69k £5.88k £2.96k £1.23k £1.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A £330 £2.00k £13.29k