THE PLAYHOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide specialised provision and social inclusion for young children with autism in order to improve functional daily living, communication and interactive play skills

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £105,509
Total expenditure: £94,563

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • TPF (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILES STANLEY Chair 02 July 2015
None on record
Robert William Sanders Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
ZAENIA ROGERS Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
NEVILLE COTTON Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
JULIAN SYKES Trustee 02 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £131.24k £110.03k £168.04k £113.91k £105.51k
Total expenditure £166.65k £101.02k £144.63k £88.79k £94.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £18.41k £12.98k £550
Income from government grants £3.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 02 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FRUIT TREE
OTTERBOURNE ROAD
COMPTON
WINCHESTER
SO21 2RT
Phone:
07964667903