ALL ABILITY SPORTS AND LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a regular weekly wheelchair basketball sports club for people with a disability, and people with additional needs and their siblings. We make fun based activity sessions accessible to all age groups and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 17 September 2015: CIO registration
- AASL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Harvey chair | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Offord | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annie Dehaney-Steven | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Fiona Ottevanger | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN OFFORD | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £2.00k | £2.77k | £10.40k | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £1.76k | £2.50k | £9.23k | £5.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 October 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY RESIDENT IN WEST ESSEX, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR COMPETITIVE AND NON-COMPETITIVE SPORT TO ASSIST THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 The Oxleys
HARLOW
Essex
CM17 0EA
- Phone:
- 01279306222
- Email:
- angie.harvey50@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window