Accounts and annual returns SHEERNESS YOUTH

Charity number: 1164072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 February 2018 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 March 2018 42 days late Download Open in new window