Financial history SHEERNESS YOUTH

Charity number: 1164072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.98k £35.53k £38.33k £32.19k £10.84k
Total expenditure £18.92k £31.88k £32.19k £14.78k £8.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k