Trustees AWEN@THELIBRARY - ARTS WHITCHURCH EGLWYS NEWYDD
Charity number: 1165980

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Mills | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ki Li Cheung | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huw Llewellyn Rogers | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Mark Stennett | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Hazlewood | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marc Alan Palmer | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH SUSAN EVANS BA HONS MA | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY EVANS | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CATHERINE LEWIS | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Claridge | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS GRIFFIN | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MARGARET DUNCAN-JONES BA, PGCE | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.