Accounts and annual returns FURLEY PAGE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1163007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 17 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 28 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 28 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window