Financial history FURLEY PAGE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1163007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £5.71k £5.92k £14.51k £14.06k £11.26k
Total expenditure £9.89k £6.12k £7.44k £17.98k £3.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A