Accounts and annual returns RE:ACT Disaster Response Limited

Charity number: 1163214
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window