Financial history RE:ACT Disaster Response Limited

Charity number: 1163214
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.15m £1.14m £1.19m £912.29k £8.09m
Total expenditure £852.37k £1.16m £1.36m £1.16m £6.39m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £542.97k
Income from government grants £1.00m £500.00k £500.00k N/A £30.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.14m £0 £1.18m £852.67k £1.22m
Income - Other trading activities £1.92k £19.39k £1.43k £59.62k £6.08m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.12m £0 £0 £793.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.39k £171 £2.74k £0 £250
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £673.62k £971.84k £1.15m £998.74k £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £178.75k £187.06k £202.54k £159.38k £5.29m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £18.63k £41.90k £41.88k £59.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0