Trustees RE:ACT Disaster Response Limited

Charity number: 1163214
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GENERAL NICHOLAS RALPH PARKER CBE Chair 30 June 2015
None on record
Audrey Fauvel Trustee 17 December 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Stileman Trustee 18 July 2019
None on record
ANDREW MACLEAN Trustee 27 June 2018
None on record
KATE HOLT Trustee 10 April 2017
ROYAL HUMANE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Sara George Trustee 30 June 2015
None on record
NICHOLAS HENRY FOTHERGILL Trustee 17 June 2015
None on record