1ST ALL SAINTS SHERBURN-IN-ELMET SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506529
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.56k £20.27k £30.09k £22.19k £34.09k
Total expenditure £10.01k £12.74k £21.25k £21.49k £26.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k £1.00k N/A N/A