1ST ALL SAINTS SHERBURN-IN-ELMET SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506529
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ms E Wilton Trustee 21 July 2017 None on record
Stacey Clarkson Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
Mrs H Groot Trustee 21 July 2017 None on record
Mr S Foster Trustee 21 July 2016 None on record
Mr J Marshall Trustee 21 July 2017 None on record
ALMA HODGESON Trustee None on record
David Omar Chair 01 September 2018 None on record
MARTIN SELBY Trustee 20 January 2013 None on record