Financial history IN YOUR HANDS

Charity number: 1163623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £22.80k £48.16k £22.62k £3.20k £2.38k
Total expenditure £20.46k £38.30k £18.54k £3.17k £3.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A