THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST

Charity number: 1165528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 June 2018 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download