THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST

Charity number: 1165528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN LOVELL Trustee 10 February 2009
C AND J CLARK LIMITED EMPLOYEES 1922 TRUST Received: On time
THE CRISPIN HALL TRUST Received: 110 days late
THE ROGER AND SARAH BANCROFT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST Received: On time
STREET CLUB AND INSTITUTE (CRISPIN HALL) Received: On time
THE STREET LIBRARY Received: On time
CLARK FOUNDATION Received: On time
CLARK FOUNDATION Received: On time
P AND M LOVELL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
HILDA AND ALICE CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 198 days late
RICHARD BANCROFT CLARK Trustee 28 September 2002
THE CLAVERHAM MEETING HOUSE TRUST Received: On time
THE CRISPIN HALL TRUST Received: 110 days late
THE JOSEPH AND FRANCES CLARK TRUST Received: 101 days late
THE JOSEPH AND FRANCES CLARK TRUST Received: 42 days late
STREET CLUB AND INSTITUTE (CRISPIN HALL) Received: On time
THE STREET LIBRARY Received: On time
CLARK FOUNDATION Received: On time
GREENBANK POOL Received: 33 days late
WHITENIGHTS CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 259 days
CLARK FOUNDATION Received: On time
WALTON PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST Overdue by 990 days
HILDA AND ALICE CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 198 days late
NATHAN CLARK 1984 CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT Received: On time
Cato Pedder Chair 02 December 2016 None on record
Eleanor Gould Trustee 22 May 2021 None on record
HUGH RUTHVEN PYM Trustee 28 September 2002
THE ALFRED GILLETT TRUST Received: On time
Patrick Colton Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Mary Katherine Arber Trustee 20 June 2020
SUMATRAN ORANGUTAN SOCIETY Received: On time
David Berkeley Hill Trustee 20 June 2020 None on record