GOODS FOR GOOD (GLOBAL)

Charity number: 1165565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £97.08k £95.43k £154.46k £171.29k £210.95k
Total expenditure £49.27k £94.37k £126.80k £170.67k £176.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.50k N/A