ACCESS BEDFORD

Charity number: 1162947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 21 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 02 February 2017 1 days late Download