ANIMAL BEHAVIOUR TRAINING COUNCIL

Charity number: 1164009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Marianne Sarah Freeman MSci PhD Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Esme Wheeler BSc MSc Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Justine Harrison Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
David Montgomery Trustee 04 May 2017 None on record
Lynn Hewison BSc MSc Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
DR ANNE MCBRIDE Trustee 05 May 2016
SOUTHAMPTON FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND DRAMA Received: On time
Harold Burrows MBE Trustee 05 May 2016
SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION (WALES) Received: On time
Lucy Hoile MSc Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Chris Laurence Trustee 04 May 2017
THE BELLA MOSS FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE OAK AND FURROWS WILDLIFE RESCUE CENTRE
TYTHERTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CORNWALL BRANCH Received: On time
THE SOLDIERS OF OXFORDSHIRE TRUST Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WILTSHIRE BRANCH Received: On time
Dr Fiona Rachel Cooke BSc MS PhD Trustee 17 July 2020
DOG BREEDING REFORM GROUP Received: On time
Jane Williams BSc Chair 03 May 2018
BEACON HILL SPORTS ASSOCIATION Received: On time