Accounts and annual returns YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CLOUGH WILLIAMS-ELLIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window