Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL & ST GABRIEL HAMWORTHY
Charity number: 1163697

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tessa Nisbet | Chair | 17 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Ryan Irish | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Elizabeth Sullivan | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Trent | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
David Colin Reed | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Anne Taylor | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ashley Dawn Ross | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Perring | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Maybury | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Coates | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Harrison-Barker | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN RICHARD SULLIVAN | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Louise Johnson | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY STOEL STAYMAN | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIV ROBERTSON | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.