THE HUNTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to individuals in Leicestershire (or other parts of the United Kingdom as the trustees see fit) or other charities, for the benefit of individuals who are in need by reason of their youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, so that such persons may improve their personal circumstances and quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 07 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR KING | Chair | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS HUNTER | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MISS KING | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS KING | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £23.05k | £29.37k | £6.31k | £7.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.20k | £28.28k | £29.25k | £19.44k | £8.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE RELIEF OF RESIDENTS IN LEICESTERSHIRE (OR SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT) WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND/OR SUCH PERSONS SO THAT THEY MAY IMPROVE THEIR PERSONAL CIRCUMSTANCES AND QUALITY OF LIFE. 3.2 NOTHING IN THE CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TEN WEALTH MANAGEMENT LTD
UNIT 16
POPLARS COURT
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2RR
- Phone:
- 01159701610
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window