HOPE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1165106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 16 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 16 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 27 September 2017 On time Download