THE SAMOSA MEDIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1165245
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 March 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 March 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 March 2017 31 days late Download