THE SAMOSA MEDIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1165245
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £41.35k £129.96k £101.11k £162.16k £45.48k
Total expenditure £48.65k £91.55k £98.38k £121.56k £78.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A