Accounts and annual returns Newark and Sherwood Community Hub

Charity number: 1164851
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 April 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 April 2022 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window