Accounts and annual returns UK FORUM ON HAEMOGLOBIN DISORDERS

Charity number: 1163743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 April 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required