OTTERY STATION

Charity number: 1163439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 April 2019 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 April 2019 62 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 March 2018 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 March 2018 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time Download