OTTERY STATION

Charity number: 1163439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.06k £10.37k £13.76k £17.58k £13.98k
Total expenditure £7.08k £16.07k £14.93k £16.95k £6.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.00k £2.84k £3.78k £6.08k N/A