CITY OF LONDON CHOIR

Charity number: 1164955
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £0 £90.15k £116.04k £70.36k £62.33k
Total expenditure £0 £75.43k £123.98k £56.12k £42.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A