Accounts and annual returns LLANFAIRYNGHORNWY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 506596
Charity reporting is overdue by 1601 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Annual return 04 April 2022 14 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 19 December 2020 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1601 days