Trustees THE HURACAN FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1170153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Peter Milligan | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Fowler | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martha Paola Ponciano Hernandez | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Hawker | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gibbons | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Florence Lloyd-Hughes | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Pedersen-Smith | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Wathen | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Barton | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry May | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andy John Smith | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.