Governing document JUG OF OIL TRUST
Charity number: 1164956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2015 as amended on 28 Nov 2023as amended on 28 Nov 2023as amended on 29 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOLLOWING A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 26 APRIL 2015, THE OBJECTS ARE: TO ADVANCE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.