Trustees HACRO

Charity number: 1163064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matt Cannon Chair 20 August 2018
None on record
Monica Hayward Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Jacqui Brabazon Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
Denise Taylor Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
Jane Allen Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Sean Bolton Trustee 20 February 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, BOVINGDON
Received: On time
DACORUM DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Eric Pillinger Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
Kirsty Watt Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
Audrey Valerie Beale JP Trustee 12 November 2015
None on record
Peter Spencer JP Trustee 12 November 2015
None on record