TAUNTON FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help relief poverty in Taunton Deane by receiving and distributing food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Spencer Hughes | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Salter | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Howard Leslie Mathers CBE | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Cobby | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CUTTING | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAULA CLINCHANT | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN WALLACE | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY HART | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.42k | £148.32k | £125.27k | £149.98k | £147.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.84k | £48.18k | £56.67k | £73.32k | £89.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN TAUNTON DEANE, SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4 Belvedere Trading Estate
TAUNTON
TA1 1BH
- Phone:
- 01823270316
- Email:
- info@taunton.foodbank.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window