THE ACTIVE RHEMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian gospel and family support through conferences and web seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 2015: CIO registration
- TAR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr OLUSEYI OLUSEUN ADESINA | Chair | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr OLUFUNBI ALABA ADESINA | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunday A Oniosun | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.76k | £7.62k | £6.15k | £7.40k | £11.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £5.32k | £4.33k | £4.77k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Nov 2015 as amended on 26 Jun 2021 as amended on 11 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE APPENDIX IN PARTICULAR BY: A) THE PROVISION OF BIBLE TEACHING TO ALL PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF THEIR CULTURE, LANGUAGE OR DENOMINATIONAL AFFILIATION TO ENCOURAGE THEIR SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND DEVELOP THEIR LEADERSHIP POTENTIAL. B) SHARING THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST WITH ALL PEOPLE BY ANY MEANS. C) BRINGING TOGETHER GROUPS OF PEOPLE WHO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST TO ENCOURAGE UNITY WITHIN THE BODY OF CHRIST. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Rupert Way
Sturry
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT2 0FH
- Phone:
- +447392518252
- Email:
- theactiverhema@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window