Trustees GRACE CHURCH GREENWICH

Charity number: 1163077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES WILLIAM SQUIRE Chair 10 August 2015
None on record
Laura Sanderson Trustee 11 January 2021
None on record
Janise Tan Trustee 15 January 2018
None on record
David Butler Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
Dr Caroline Newton Trustee 10 October 2016
None on record
Rev ANDREW JOHN LATIMER Trustee 10 August 2015
None on record
Dr ANDREW JOHN SACH Trustee 10 August 2015
None on record
SAM WILDE Trustee 10 August 2015
None on record