Trustees BARBICAN ART SOCIETY
Charity number: 1164194

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Sunman | Chair | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Oliver | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Wallis | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Renu Gupta | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Feona Jean Hamilton | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Steele JP | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francois-Xavier Villemin | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Mapstone | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Jowsey | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN LUMLEY FRCS | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.