Accounts and annual returns IPSOS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164761
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 May 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 May 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 August 2020 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 August 2020 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window