AFFCAD UK

Charity number: 1165059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.77k £33.85k £103.51k £32.48k £40.78k
Total expenditure £9.06k £32.22k £100.97k £34.87k £30.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A