LEEDS NORTH AND WEST FOODBANK

Charity number: 1162983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 07 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 14 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download