CRUSADER COMMUNITY BOATING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE RUN BOAT TRIPS ON NORTHAMPTONSHIRE'S WATERWAYS ON OUR SPECIALLY EQUIPPED WIDE BEAM BOAT FOR LOCAL GROUPS OF DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE FROM CARE HOMES. THE SERVICE IS RUN BY A GROUP OF VOLUNTEER CREW AND RELIES ON VOLUNTARY DONATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 August 2015: CIO registration
- CRUSADER COMMUNITY BOATS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN NEAL | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Watts | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Garratt | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hickerson | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Hugh Fellows | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jill Baker | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Colman | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.60k | £62.28k | £18.04k | £36.54k | £21.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.50k | £142.95k | £24.28k | £27.80k | £31.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 13 AUG 2015 AMENDED ON 13/01/2016 AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FROM PRIMARY SCHOOLS WITHIN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE BY OFFERING A MOBILE CLASSROOM TO COMPLEMENT THEIR SCHOOL-BASED EDUCATION AND PROVIDE A MEANINGFUL AND RELEVANT ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO LEARN ABOUT WATER SAFETY AND GAIN AN APPRECIATION OF THEIR NATURAL SURROUNDINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 PYGHTLE WAY
EAST HUNSBURY
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 0QJ
- Phone:
- 07729 183 232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window