ESTATE CHARITY OF G H NICHOLLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with the terms of the Trust , the available income is paid to specified churches. The Trustees are satisfied that these purposes remain charitable and for the public benefit. The Trustees have complied with the duty in Section 4 of the Charity Act 2006 to have due regard to public benefit guidance published by the Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Hampshire
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 October 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyds Bank Plc | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/02/2020 | 14/02/2021 | 14/02/2022 | 14/02/2023 | 14/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £3.21k | £2.47k | £2.86k | £3.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76k | £3.09k | £2.60k | £2.85k | £3.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 February 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2020 | 21 January 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PROBATE REGISTRY OF WALES (BANGOR) ON 11/06/1969
Charitable objects
1. UPKEEP OF BOLLINGTON CHURCHYARD 2. UPKEEP OF LYTHAM CHURCHYARD 3. UPKEEP OF SCALBY CHURCHYARD 4. FOR THE AUGMENTATION OF THE LIVING OF ALL SAINTS CHURCH, ODIHAM
Area of benefit
BOLLINGTON, LYTHAM, SCALBY AND ODIHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyds Banking Group
City Park
The Droveway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 7AU
- Phone:
- 0345 300 0304
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window