Financial history MARGARET CLITHEROW TRUST

Charity number: 1163629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £48.34k £71.54k £52.96k £75.71k £130.71k
Total expenditure £16.12k £55.07k £53.00k £63.07k £92.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £4.65k