WORSHIP AND LEADERSHIP ACADEMY

Charity number: 1163747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 15 March 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 15 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download