WORSHIP AND LEADERSHIP ACADEMY

Charity number: 1163747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £5.53k £16.42k £31.84k £23.20k £22.61k
Total expenditure £10.51k £18.87k £27.24k £27.58k £24.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A