MILTON'S COTTAGE TRUST (CIO)

Charity number: 1163039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download