MILTON'S COTTAGE TRUST (CIO)

Charity number: 1163039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £55.90k £53.71k £53.16k £57.91k £81.32k
Total expenditure £55.19k £50.14k £48.62k £47.88k £75.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £250 £10.00k £11.33k