CATHEDRAL CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1163277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 18 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 09 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 27 August 2017 On time Download